VA SB1075 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Air Pollution Control Board; public notification. Requires that the Air Pollution Control Board require the applicant to take certain public notice actions, prior to granting any variance to an existing regulation or issuing any permit for (i) a new fossil fuel-fired generating facility with a capacity of 500 megawatts or more, (ii) a major modification to an existing source that is a fossil fuel-fired generating facility with a capacity of 500 megawatts or more, (iii) a new fossil fuel-fired compressor station facility used to transport natural gas, or (iv) a major modification to an existing source that is a fossil fuel-fired compressor station facility used to transport natural gas, if the Board finds that there is a locality particularly affected by such variance or permit.
Title
Environmental Quality, Department of; public comment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 39-N) (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1110) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1110 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1075ER) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (56-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109847D-S2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Lopez, Guy, Bloxom |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Mason, Suetterlein |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (60-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1075H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108993D-H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108993D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107674D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1075ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107674D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107674D-S1 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104770D |