VA SB1073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Removing motor vehicles from roadway. Requires the driver of a motor vehicle involved in an accident on a high occupancy toll (HOT) lane that is under construction on Interstate 66 to move such motor vehicle to the nearest pull-off area if the driver can safely do so, the vehicle is movable, and there are no injuries or deaths resulting from the accident. The bill provides that such requirement will expire upon the certification by the Secretary of Transportation that the HOT lane construction on Interstate 66 is complete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; removal from roadway when involved in an accident on HOT lane on I-66.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (9-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1073ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-13HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101626D-E
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1073E
2019-01-21SenateAmendments by Senator Marsden agreed to
2019-01-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-21SenateRead second time
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Transportation (9-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-12-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101626D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462888(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1073
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1073+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1073E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1073ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0265+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0025+SB1073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1073+SB1073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0126SB1073+SB1073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0020+SB1073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0099+SB1073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0600SB1073+SB1073
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2693+SB1073

Bill Comments

feedback