VA SB1071 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Closure of the Central Virginia Training Center prohibited. Provides that the Central Virginia Training Center shall not be closed and shall instead remain open.
Title
Central Virginia Training Center; closure prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (13-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reconsidered by Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101145D |