VA SB1065 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of General Services; identifying high-risk structures; desirability and feasibility of certain key boxes. Directs the Department of General Services (the Department) to (i) determine which state-owned structures have a higher likelihood of being involved in a natural or man-made emergency that may require special access by law-enforcement personnel and (ii) study the desirability and feasibility of coordinating with local law enforcement in the installation of certain key boxes permitting law-enforcement officials to gain access to such structure during an emergency. The bill permits the Department to implement procedures for installing such key boxes to the extent that the Department determines such action is desirable and feasible. The bill directs the Department to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-owned structures; DGS to determine which structures are high-risk, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1180)
2020-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1180 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1065ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HousePassed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-03-05HouseAmendment by Delegate Aird agreed to
2020-03-05HouseRead third time
2020-03-04HousePassed by for the day
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-27HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1065S1
2020-02-10SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107537D-S1
2020-02-10SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-10SenateRead second time
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107537D-S1
2020-02-05SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105486D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB1065&201+sum+SB1065
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1065+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1065S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1065ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1180+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0105+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0410SB1065+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0450SB1065+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0451SB1065+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1104V0067+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0439+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0454+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0445+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0485+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0525+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2011+SB1065
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1639SB1065+SB1065

Bill Comments

feedback