VA SB1064 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Environmental Quality; combined sewer overflow outfalls; James River watershed. Requires the owner or operator of any combined sewer overflow (CSO) system east of Charlottesville that discharges into the James River watershed to submit to the Department of Environmental Quality an interim and a final plan to address the requirements of any consent special order issued by the State Water Control Board. The bill specifies dates by which the owner or operator must initiate construction and complete work to carry out such plans.
Title
Combined sewer overflow outfalls; James River watershed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0634) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 634 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1064ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title replaced 20108976D-H1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1064H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108976D-H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108976D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104654D-E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1064E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104654D |