VA SB1062 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Election administration; presidential elections; officers of election and ballot scanner machines. Requires any precinct having more than 4,000 registered voters to have not less than five officers of election serving at a presidential election and requires the electoral board to appoint additional officers as may be needed to comply with this requirement. The bill also requires the governing body of a county or city that uses ballot scanner machines at elections to provide for any precinct having more than 4,000 registered voters not less than two such machines at a presidential election, but provides an exception for localities that determine a second scanner is not necessary at a particular precinct on the basis of voter turnout and the average wait time for voters in previous presidential elections. Current law requires not less than three officers of election at each precinct and at least one ballot scanner machine at each precinct that uses such machines.
Title
Presidential elections; number of officers of election and ballot scanner machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1062ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100745D |