VA SB1060 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Primary elections; voter registration by political party. Adds party affiliation to the information that an applicant is asked to provide when registering to vote. The applicant may indicate that he is an independent. The bill requires the State Board of Elections, in September 2015, to notify all registered voters of the new party registration law and send them a return card to indicate their party affiliation or independent status. Voters may change their party affiliation or independent status by written notice at any time before the registration records are closed in advance of an election. The bill (i) requires the state party chairman to notify the State Board by January 31 of each year whether the party will close or open its primaries, (ii) requires that primary candidate petitions be signed and witnessed by voters registered as affiliated with the party conducting the primary, (iii) sets the required number of petition signatures at one percent of the number of voters registered as affiliated with the party in the election district where the primary is being held, and (iv) allows an official political party to retain that status as long as at least 15 percent of the Commonwealth's registered voters are registered as affiliated with that party.
Title
Primary elections; voter registration by political party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100743D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 418.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 423.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 516.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |