VA SB106 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Standards and criteria for congressional and state legislative districts. Provides criteria by which congressional and state legislative districts are to be drawn, including equal population, racial and ethnic fairness, respect for existing political boundaries, contiguity, compactness, and communities of interest. The criteria set out would apply to those districts drawn following the 2020 United States Census and thereafter. This bill incorporates SB 718, SB 740, and SB 752 and is identical to HB 1598.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional and state legislative districts; standards and criteria.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (25-Y 12-N) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Suetterlein agreed to 18105938D-S2 (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18SenateCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18SenatePassed by for the day (20-Y 19-N)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB106ER)
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled
2018-03-02SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2018-03-02SenateReconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-03-02SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed House with amendment (90-Y 9-N)
2018-02-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-02-28HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-28HouseRead third time
2018-02-27HouseRead second time
2018-02-23HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N)
2018-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2018-01-26SenatePending question ordered (25-Y 12-N)
2018-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB106S2
2018-01-25SenateTitle replaced 18105938D-S2
2018-01-25SenateSubstitute by Senator Suetterlein agreed to 18105938D-S2 (23-Y 17-N)
2018-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-25SenateFloor substitute printed 18105938D-S2 (David R. Suetterlein)
2018-01-25SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18105342D-S1
2018-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-25SenateRead second time
2018-01-24SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-22SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-22SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-19SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateIncorporates SB752 Sturtevant
2018-01-16SenateIncorporates SB740 Howell
2018-01-16SenateIncorporates SB718 Chase
2018-01-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105342D-S1
2018-01-16SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2017-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100790D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB106
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB106+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB106S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB106S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB106ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0015+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0066SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0130SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0147SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0148SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1801V0025+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0102+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1177+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0841SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0855SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0856SB0106+SB0106
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1225SB0106+SB0106

Bill Comments

feedback