VA SB1059 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; employment of special counsel. Provides that when entering into a contract with special counsel, the Office of the Governor or Office of the Attorney General, as applicable, must make a copy of the contract available to the public on the website of the Governor or the Attorney General. However, the Attorney General may temporarily not disclose such information upon making a written determination that such action is necessary to protect attorney-client or otherwise privileged information or that immediate disclosure of the existence of special counsel, or any other sensitive information, could compromise the initiation, handling, or conclusion of any investigation or case matter handled by the Attorney General or special counsel and might put the Commonwealth and its citizens at a disadvantage. The bill also provides that prior to entering into a contract with special counsel, the Attorney General must make a written determination that the representation is both cost effective and in the public interest. In addition, the bill (i) requires the Governor and the Attorney General to submit an annual report to the General Assembly describing the use of contracts for special counsel, (ii) provides that the Attorney General, or counsel to the Governor in cases in which the Attorney General has a conflict, shall retain control over special counsel, and (iii) limits the contingency fee that may be charged by special counsel depending on the amount recovered.
Title
Special counsel; employment by Attorney General or Governor, requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 11-N) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 11-N) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 74 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1059ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 11-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (76-Y 21-N) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105664D-S2 |
2015-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Habeeb, Campbell, Lindsey |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Stuart, Wexton |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 27-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendment (72-Y 27-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (15-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1059S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104265D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104265D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100740D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |