VA SB1055 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Read third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Remaining at place of riot or unlawful assembly after warning to disperse; penalty. Increases from a Class 3 to a Class 1 misdemeanor the penalty for failure to leave the place of any riot or unlawful assembly after having been lawfully warned to disperse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remaining at place of riot or unlawful assembly after warning to disperse; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N) (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-23SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N)
2017-01-20SenatePassed by for the day
2017-01-19SenatePassed by for the day
2017-01-18SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16SenateReported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 4-N)
2017-01-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103636D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182407(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback