VA SB1052 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1052

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Charitable Gaming Board; regulations of the Board; electronic or mechanical equipment used in the conduct of charitable gaming. Increases the number of electronic pull tabs that may be placed in the social quarters of a qualified organization from nine, as currently provided by Virginia Charitable Gaming Board regulations, to 28.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Charitable Gaming Board; regulations of the Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106490D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateAssigned GL&T sub: Gaming
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104738D

Same As/Similar To

SB1052 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182340.19(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback