VA SB1051 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dealer franchises; administrative fees and penalties. Extends the protection that dealers currently retain for chargebacks to administrative fees and other penalties. Current law protects dealers who seek to challenge chargebacks for warranty and sales incentive claims from having the disputed amounts taken from open accounts with the manufacturer while the dispute is ongoing. This bill extends this protection to dealers challenging a manufacturer's imposition of administrative fees and other penalties. This bill contains technical amendments and is identical to
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; imposition of financial penalties, warranty and sales incentive obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1051ER) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101539D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1632 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)