VA SB1050 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permit for coal ash landfill storage; provision of public water supply. Prohibits the Department of Environmental Quality from approving an application for a new coal ash landfill permit if the facility boundary is located within one mile of an existing residential area that is not served by municipal water supply, unless the owner or operator of the coal ash landfill has offered to provide, at its expense, (i) municipal water supply service for such residential area and (ii) any requested service connections for residential properties in existence at the time such permit application is filed. The bill requires any such owner or operator of a coal ash landfill offering to provide such municipal water supply service or requested service connections to make such offer in writing to any resident located within one mile of the facility boundary and in coordination with the municipal water supply service authority in which the coal ash landfill will be located. Permit for coal ash landfill storage; provision of public water supply. Prohibits the Department of Environmental Quality from approving an application for a new coal ash landfill permit if the facility boundary is located within one mile of an existing residential area that is not served by municipal water supply, unless the owner or operator of the coal ash landfill has offered to provide, at its expense, (i) municipal water supply service for such residential area and (ii) any requested service connections for residential properties in existence at the time such permit application is filed. The bill requires any such owner or operator of a coal ash landfill offering to provide such municipal water supply service or requested service connections to make such offer in writing to any resident located within one mile of the facility boundary and in coordination with the municipal water supply service authority in which the coal ash landfill will be located.
Title
Coal ash landfill storage; provision of public water supply, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0503) | |
2023-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 503 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1050ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1050S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105993D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105993D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102733D |