VA SB105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Chapters 45 and 51 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, Special Session I; retroactive and prospective effect. Provides that the provisions of Chapters 45 and 51 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, Special Session I, shall be given retroactive and prospective effect. The bill also provides that its provisions shall not create any cause of action for damages against the Commonwealth or any of its political subdivisions, nor shall it form the basis for relief in any habeas corpus proceeding or appellate proceeding. Chapters 45 and 51 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, Special Session I; retroactive and prospective effect. Provides that the provisions of Chapters 45 and 51 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, Special Session I, shall be given retroactive and prospective effect. The bill also provides that its provisions shall not create any cause of action for damages against the Commonwealth or any of its political subdivisions, nor shall it form the basis for relief in any habeas corpus proceeding or appellate proceeding.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; evidence obtained during prohibited stop.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22102985D-E |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB105E |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (11-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102985D |