VA SB1049 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1049
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Involuntary commitment; notice and participation. Clarifies the role of individuals identified and requested by a person in the involuntary commitment process to assist him in the process. The bill sets out such authorized individuals' right to receive medical records, notice of hearings, and copies of orders and to participate in hearings and the discharge planning process. Involuntary commitment; notice and participation. Clarifies the role of individuals identified and requested by a person in the involuntary commitment process to assist him in the process. The bill sets out such authorized individuals' right to receive medical records, notice of hearings, and copies of orders and to participate in hearings and the discharge planning process.
Title
Involuntary commitment; notice and participation, discharge plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-25 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1049S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107616D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107616D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105346D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1049 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127.1:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 814 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 817 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 817.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 838 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |