VA SB1049 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regional jail construction and contracts; state reimbursement. Reduces from one-half to one-fourth the maximum state reimbursement for capital costs for construction, enlargement, or renovation of regional jails and jails where there is a regional contract for cooperative jailing. The Commonwealth will continue to reimburse up to one-half of the capital costs for (i) the enlargement or renovation of any regional jail created prior to July 1, 2015, and (ii) the construction, enlargement, or renovation of any regional jail approved by the Governor prior to such date. However, for any jail project that was not approved by the Governor prior to July 1, 2015, excluding any regional jail created prior to such date, no reimbursement will be paid by the Commonwealth unless the project is specifically authorized in the general appropriation act.
Title
Regional jails; reimbursement of capital costs, regional contracts for cooperative jailing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1049ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 11-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 11-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 15105707D-S1 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1049ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 15105168D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed House with substitute (62-Y 34-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1049H1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105168D-H1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105168D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15101139D-E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1049E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101139D |