VA SB1048 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; public assistance and operation of the Virginia Horse Center Foundation. Directs the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to investigate and negotiate involvement of the Commonwealth in the whole or partial operation or management of the Virginia Horse Center Foundation, including the addition of state-appointed members to the Board of Directors of the Foundation. The bill prohibits expenditure of state funds for the purchase, transfer, or lease of real property related to the investigation unless specifically appropriated for that purpose or approved by the General Assembly.
Title
Virginia Horse Center Foundation; DACS to investigate and negotiate public assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1048ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (82-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1048S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107342D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107342D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105375D |