VA SB1047 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification of registration. Provides that a registered sex offender who enters an emergency shelter designated by the Commonwealth or any political subdivision thereof and operated in response to a declared state or local emergency shall, as soon as practicable after entry, notify a member of the shelter's staff who is responsible for providing security of such person's status as a registered sex offender. The bill provides that any person who fails to notify the shelter's staff of his status as a registered sex offender is guilty of a Class 3 misdemeanor. This bill provides that no person shall be denied entry solely on the basis of his status as a sex offender unless such entry is otherwise prohibited by law, but emergency shelter staff may deny entry of a person on such registry who has been convicted of a sexually violent offense for a period of time necessary to ensure the safety of other individuals admitted to the emergency shelter. This bill is identical to HB 2303.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sex offenders in emergency shelters; notification registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 20-N) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 20-N)
2019-04-03SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-03-21SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1047ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (92-Y 6-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107699D-S2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-19HouseDelegates: Leftwich, Bell, Robert B., Herring
2019-02-19HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-18SenateSenators: Cosgrove, Obenshain, Petersen
2019-02-18SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-18SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with substitute (87-Y 12-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1047H1
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106466D-H1
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106466D-H1
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N)
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1047S1
2019-01-16SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104817D-S1
2019-01-16SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-16SenateRead second time
2019-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104817D-S1
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-12-02SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100422D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91906.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1047
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1047+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1047S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1047H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1047S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1047ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0031+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0023SB1047+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0053SB1047+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0323+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2658+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0558SB1047+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0740SB1047+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3342+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1107SB1047+SB1047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1153SB1047+SB1047

Bill Comments

feedback