VA SB1044 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0943)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0943)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral directors and embalmers; Board to promulgate regulations for licensure. Directs the Board of Funeral Directors and Embalmers to promulgate regulations that establish requirements of licensure for funeral directors and embalmers.
Title
Funeral directors and embalmers; Board to promulgate regulations for licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] |
Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 18-N) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0943) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 943 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1044ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (76-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (76-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1044S2 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator McPike agreed to 20107505D-S2 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20107052D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20107505D-S2 (McPike) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107052D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104415D |