VA SB1042 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0341)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; notification of denial. Requires the general registrars to notify a person whose registration has been denied within 14 days of the denial and provides that a person denied registration may appeal such denial by filing a petition within 10 days of being notified of the denial. Currently, the law simply requires that such notice be made promptly and that the appeal be filed within 10 days after the denial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; notification of denial by general registrars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0341)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 341 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1042ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-01-18SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2018-11-24SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-11-24SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101184D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242114(n/a)See Bill Text
242422(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1042
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1042+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1042ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0341+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0054+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0062SB1042+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0086SB1042+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0095SB1042+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1801V0026+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0091+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2928+SB1042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2971+SB1042

Bill Comments

feedback