VA SB1041 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Division superintendents; certain localities; qualifications. Provides that the Board of Education shall require any candidate for division superintendent of a local school division serving a locality with a population greater than 140,000 people to have (i) a master's degree and relevant endorsements or a doctorate degree in an education-related field and (ii) at least five years of instructional, administrative, and supervisory experience in education, with no exceptions or substitutes for senior leadership experience in non-education fields. The Board of Education may substitute certain requirements for education-specific endorsements, degrees, or educational, administrative, or supervisory experience for a certain amount of experience in senior leadership positions outside of the education field only for local school divisions serving a locality with a population not exceeding 140,000 people.
Title
Division superintendents; certain localities, qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Education |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102619D-E |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1041E |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (8-Y 7-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102619D |