VA SB1041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act. Provides that a telephone solicitor and the seller on whose behalf or for whose benefit a telephone solicitation call offering or advertising a seller's property, goods, or services is made or initiated are jointly and severally liable for violations of the Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act (?§59.1-510 et seq.). The measure establishes a presumption that a telephone solicitation call offering or advertising a seller's property, goods, or services is made or initiated on behalf of or for the benefit of the seller and provides that this presumption may be rebutted if it is shown by clear and convincing evidence that (i) the seller did not retain or request the telephone solicitor to make telephone solicitation calls on the seller's behalf or for the seller's benefit and (ii) such telephone solicitation calls were made by the telephone solicitor without the seller's knowledge or consent. The measure removes a provision that authorized the Commissioner of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to inquire into possible violations of the Act and contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to HB 2600.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Va. Telephone Privacy Protection Act; joint liability of seller & telephone solicitor for violation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1041ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105395D-ES1
2019-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1041ES1
2019-01-24SenateAmendment by Senator Black agreed to
2019-01-24SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105395D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105395D-S1
2019-01-21SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101057D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591510(n/a)See Bill Text
591514.1(n/a)See Bill Text
591515(n/a)See Bill Text
591517(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1041
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1041+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1041S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1041ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1041ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0264+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0043+SB1041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1041+SB1041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1041+SB1041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1041+SB1041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1041+SB1041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0150+SB1041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2692+SB1041

Bill Comments

feedback