VA SB1040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Compensation of local jails for cost of incarceration. Provides for local jails to be compensated for the actual cost of incarcerating convicted felons at the rate calculated in the Compensation Board's annual jail cost report. Current law provides for jails to be compensated for the cost of incarceration of convicted felons as provided for in the general appropriation act. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriations act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jails, local; compensation for cost of incarceration of convicted felons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100730D-E
2019-01-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1040E
2019-01-18SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1040E
2019-01-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-18SenateRead second time
2019-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2018-11-15SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-11-15SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100730D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53120.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback