VA SB1040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); record exclusion for personal contact information; limitation. Provides that personal contact information provided to a public body for the purpose of receiving electronic mail from the public body is excluded from the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA, provided that the electronic mail recipient has requested that the public body not disclose such information. The bill defines "personal contact information" as the home or business (i) address, (ii) email address, or (iii) telephone number or comparable number assigned to any other electronic communication device. Current law excludes "personal information," which is defined as including a broader range of information than the limited definition of personal contact information in the bill.
Title
FOIA; record exclusion for personal contact information, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 140 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1040ER) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101868D-E |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1040E |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101868D |