VA SB104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Elimination of mandatory minimum sentences; modification Elimination of mandatory minimum sentences; modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term of confinement for felony offenses; report. Except for aggravated murder of a law-enforcement officer, eliminates all mandatory minimum sentences of confinement from the Code of Virginia. The bill directs the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to establish a work group to evaluate the feasibility of resentencing persons previously convicted of a felony offense that was punishable by a mandatory minimum term of confinement and to report its findings by November 1, 2022.
Title
Mandatory minimum sentences; elimination, modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (17-Y 23-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB104S2 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Morrissey agreed to 22106532D-S2 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 22104619D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22106532D-S2 (Morrissey) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22104619D-ES1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB104ES1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104619D-S1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (10-Y 6-N) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104619D-S1 |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Incorporates SB252 (Edwards) |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100637D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 154 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 36.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 36.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 51.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 53.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 61 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 297.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 865.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |