VA SB104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; privileges of gift shop licenses. Expands the privileges of a gift shop license to allow the licensee to give to any person to whom wine or beer may be lawfully sold (i) a sample of wine not to exceed two ounces by volume or (ii) a sample of beer not to exceed four ounces by volume for on-premises consumption. Such licensee may also give samples of wine and beer in designated areas at events held by the licensee for the purpose of featuring and educating the consuming public about the alcoholic beverages being tasted.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; expands privileges of gift shop licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB104ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101136D-E |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB104E |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101136D |