VA SB104 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Outpatient treatment; compliance. Provides that the community services board, behavioral health authority, or designated provider charged with monitoring a person's compliance with an involuntary outpatient treatment order shall report any material noncompliance with that order to the judge or special justice. Upon receipt of a report of material noncompliance, the judge or special justice shall issue a temporary detention order and then proceed to hold an involuntary commitment hearing, as a result of which the court may revoke outpatient treatment and order the person's involuntary commitment. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Outpatient treatment; community services board et al., to report any material noncompliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-03 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087990216 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB104 |