VA SB1038 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Investment in research and technology. Makes changes to the Commonwealth Research Commercialization Fund (CRCF), including adding a federal research facility located in the Commonwealth to the list of entities eligible to apply for a grant, and clarifies that the length of time that a business has been incorporated does not affect an entity's eligibility for an award. The bill provides for the Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority (IEIA) to consult with the Secretary of Technology on the guidelines developed for the administration of the CRCF. The bill also transfers the authority to appoint the five citizen members of the Research and Technology Investment Advisory Committee from the IEIA to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Investment in research and technology; changes to CRCF, adding federal research facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 490 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1038ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed House (93-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Science and Technology (18-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1038S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 15104759D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 15104759D-S1 (Hanger) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101144D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2220.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |