VA SB1037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement of certain offenses. Allows a person to petition for expungement of a deferred disposition dismissal for underage alcohol possession or using a false ID to obtain alcohol when the offense occurred prior to the person's twenty-first birthday; all court costs, fines, and restitution have been paid; and the person seeking the expungement is at least 21 years of age and has no other alcohol-related convictions. The bill provides that any person seeking expungement of an alcohol-related charge shall be assessed a $150 fee, which shall be paid into the state treasury and credited to the Department of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Underage alcoholic possession, etc.; expungement of certain offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1037S1
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105986D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105986D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2018-11-15SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-11-15SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100230D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback