VA SB1036 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Tourism Authority; exemption from personnel and procurement procedures; repeal. Repeals the exemption of the Virginia Tourism Authority from the provisions of the Virginia Public Procurement Act and the Virginia Personnel Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Tourism Authority; repeals exemption from personnel and procurement procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N 4-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseLeft in General Laws
2023-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2023-02-13HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2023-01-30SenateRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N 4-A)
2023-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101711D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback