VA SB1036 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DMAS; waiver eligibility criteria; dependents of active duty military. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to amend eligibility criteria for the Intellectual Disability waiver and the Individual and Family Developmental Disabilities Support waiver to allow the dependent of an active duty military member to maintain his position on the waiting list following a transfer of the active duty military member to an assignment outside the Commonwealth, so long as the active duty military member maintains the Commonwealth as his legal residence to which he intends to return following completion of military service.
Title
Dependents of active duty military members; DMAS shall amend waiver eligibility criteria.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0671) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 671 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1036ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1036S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104370D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104370D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100911D |