VA SB1034 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0202)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Causing a telephone or other device to signal with intent to annoy; emergency communications; penalty. Modernizes the statute prohibiting harassment of emergency personnel in the performance of their duties by causing a telephone to ring to include a prohibition on causing any other device to signal with the intent to annoy, harass, hinder, or delay such emergency personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone, digital pager, or other device; causing to ring or signal with intent to annoy, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0202)
2023-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 202 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24SenateSigned by President
2023-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-21SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1034ER)
2023-02-21SenateEnrolled
2023-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16HouseRead third time
2023-02-15HouseRead second time
2023-02-13HouseReported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-02-07HouseRead first time
2023-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1034S1
2023-01-30SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23104489D-S1
2023-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-01-30SenateRead second time
2023-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 23104489D-S1
2023-01-25SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2023-01-18SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2023-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101703D

Same As/Similar To

HB1590 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
HB1590 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182429(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1034
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1034+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1034S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1034ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0202+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23104489D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1034F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1034FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1034FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S12V0030+SB1034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0082+SB1034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0133SB1034+SB1034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0155SB1034+SB1034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0245+SB1034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1897+SB1034

Bill Comments

feedback