VA SB1033 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment of guardian ad litem for minor witness. Authorizes a general district court, when the court determines circumstances so require, to appoint a discreet and competent guardian ad litem to represent a minor who is required to testify as a witness in a case before the court. The bill provides that such guardian ad litem shall be compensated for the provision of such services consistent with the rates and procedures set by the Supreme Court of Virginia for compensation of court-appointed counsel. Appointment of guardian ad litem for minor witness. Authorizes a general district court, when the court determines circumstances so require, to appoint a discreet and competent guardian ad litem to represent a minor who is required to testify as a witness in a case before the court. The bill provides that such guardian ad litem shall be compensated for the provision of such services consistent with the rates and procedures set by the Supreme Court of Virginia for compensation of court-appointed counsel.
Title
Guardian ad litem; appointment for minor witness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 378 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1033ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1033S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105280D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105280D-S1 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101705D |