VA SB1033 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1033

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile community correctional centers and facilities; establishment; placement of juveniles. Changes the term "juvenile correctional centers and facilities" to "juvenile community correctional centers and facilities." The bill further provides that any juvenile community correctional center established after July 1, 2020, shall (i) be located within a locality in which at least five percent of all juvenile commitments occur statewide, using an average of the rate of commitments of the three most recent consecutive years, and (ii) be designed to confine 30 juveniles or fewer. The bill also states that the Department of Juvenile Justice shall place children at the juvenile community correctional center located closest to their primary residence and within one hour of such residence via motor vehicle and within one and one-half hours of such residence via public transportation. If such placement is not available, the Department shall use an alternative placement that is closest to the juvenile's primary residence, such as a local juvenile detention center. Under current law, the Department may place such children at such facilities as are available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile community correctional centers and facilities; establishment, placement of juveniles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-31SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104653D
2020-01-17SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Same As/Similar To

SB1033 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161249(n/a)See Bill Text
161269.1(n/a)See Bill Text
161285.1(n/a)See Bill Text
161285.2(n/a)See Bill Text
161309.4(n/a)See Bill Text
161322.5(n/a)See Bill Text
161322.6(n/a)See Bill Text
182431.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182473(n/a)See Bill Text
182473.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182474(n/a)See Bill Text
182474.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182477.2(n/a)See Bill Text
18248.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221837(n/a)See Bill Text
223007(n/a)See Bill Text
221209.1:2(n/a)See Bill Text
221289(n/a)See Bill Text
291317(n/a)See Bill Text
511212(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.10(n/a)See Bill Text
91801(n/a)See Bill Text
91903(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback