VA SB1031 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
False information and hoax criminal activities; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to knowingly, with the intent to mislead a law-enforcement agency, cause another to give a false report to any law-enforcement official by publicly simulating a violation of Chapter 4 (?§18.2-30 et seq.) (Crimes Against the Person) or Chapter 5 (?§18.2-77 et seq.) (Crimes Against Property) of Title 18.2. This bill is identical to HB 2056.
Title
Law-enforcement officials; to knowingly, with intent to mislead an official, giving false reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 498 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1031ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-19 | House | Delegates: Yancey, Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring |
2019-02-19 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Chase, McDougle, Deeds |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House with amendment (90-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1031S1 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104815D-S1 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104815D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-10-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-10-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100144D |