VA SB103 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shipping and Logistics Headquarters Grant Program. Updates some provisions of the Shipping and Logistics Headquarters Grant Program to reflect changes in the agreement between the Commonwealth and a qualified company.
Title
Shipping and Logistics Headquarters Grant Program; updates certain provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB103ER) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102769D |
Same As/Similar To
HB324 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
HB324 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
HB324 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)