VA SB1027 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Clean Energy and Community Flood Preparedness Act; fund. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to incorporate into regulations previously adopted by the State Air Pollution Control Board certain provisions establishing a carbon dioxide cap and trade program to reduce emissions released by electric generation facilities. Such provisions are required to comply with the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative model rule. The bill authorizes the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality to establish, implement, and manage an auction program to sell allowances into a market-based trading program. The bill requires revenues from the sale of carbon allowances, to the extent permitted by Article X, Section 7 of the Constitution of Virginia, to be deposited in an interest-bearing account and to be distributed without further appropriation (i) to the Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund; (ii) to the Department of Housing and Community Development for low-income energy efficiency programs; (iii) for administrative expenses; and (iv) to the Department of Housing and Community Development in partnership with the Department of Mines Minerals and Energy to administer and implement low-income energy efficiency programs. The bill also provides that if the Governor seeks to include the Commonwealth as a full participate in the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative, the regulations shall require certain purchasers shall be responsible for obtaining allowances under certain agreements. The bill authorizes the costs of allowances to be recovered by Phase I and Phase II utilities from ratepayers and continues the Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund as the Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund for the purpose of creating a low-interest loan program to help inland and coastal communities that are subject to recurrent or repetitive flooding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy and Community Flood Preparedness Act; fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator McDougle rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-20HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-19HouseReferred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1027S1
2020-02-11SenateAmendments by Senator McDougle rejected (19-Y 21-N)
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107677D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N)
2020-02-04SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107677D-S1
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced bill reprinted 20105571D
2020-01-16SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105571D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011329(n/a)See Bill Text
1011330(n/a)See Bill Text
101603.24(n/a)See Bill Text
101603.25(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback