VA SB1027 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 3/16/17)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil; permitting of pharmaceutical processors to manufacture and provide. Authorizes a pharmaceutical processor, after obtaining a permit from the Board of Pharmacy (the Board) and under the supervision of a licensed pharmacist, to manufacture and provide cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil to be used for the treatment of intractable epilepsy. The bill sets limits on the number of permits that the Board may issue and requires that the Board adopt regulations establishing health, safety, and security requirements for permitted processors. The bill provides that only a licensed practitioner of medicine or osteopathy who is a neurologist or who specializes in the treatment of epilepsy may issue a written certification to a patient for the use of cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil. The bill also requires that a practitioner who issues a written certification for cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil, the patient issued such certification, and, if the patient is a minor or incapacitated, the patient's parent or legal guardian register with the Board. The bill requires further that a pharmaceutical processor shall not provide cannabidiol oil or THC-A oil to a patient or a patient's parent or legal guardian without first verifying that the patient, the patient's parent or legal guardian if the patient is a minor or incapacitated, and the practitioner who issued the written certification have registered with the Board. Finally, the bill provides an affirmative defense for agents and employees of pharmaceutical processors in a prosecution for the manufacture, possession, or distribution of marijuana. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol oil and THC-A oil; permitting of pharmaceutical processors to manufacture and provide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House of Delegates - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House of Delegates - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House of Delegates - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 3/16/17)
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1027ER)
2017-02-20SenateEnrolled
2017-02-15SenateTitle replaced 17105443D-H1
2017-02-15SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1027H1
2017-02-15HouseAmendment by Delegate Albo agreed to
2017-02-15HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105443D-H1
2017-02-15HouseRead third time
2017-02-14HouseRead second time
2017-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105443D-H1
2017-02-13HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-02-09HouseReferred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2017-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2017-01-19SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
2017-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2017-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 17101565D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1027
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1027+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1027H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1027ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0040+SB1027
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0075SB1027+SB1027
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0102SB1027+SB1027
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0283+SB1027
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0129+SB1027
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2358+SB1027
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0563SB1027+SB1027

Bill Comments

feedback