VA SB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; no-excuse in-person voting available beginning on second Saturday immediately preceding election. Allows for any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in person beginning on the second Saturday immediately preceding any election in which he is qualified to vote without providing a reason or making prior application for an absentee ballot. The bill makes absentee voting in person available beginning on the forty-fifth day prior to the election and ending at 5:00 p.m. on the Saturday immediately preceding the election. The bill retains the current provisions for voting with an absentee ballot by mail or in person prior to the second Saturday immediately preceding the election, including the application requirement and the list of statutory reasons for absentee voting. The provisions of the bill do not become effective until the November 3, 2020, general election, and the State Board of Elections is required to submit a report on the procedures and instructions it promulgates for conducting absentee voting pursuant to the provisions of the bill. This bill is identical to HB 2790.
Title
Absentee voting; no-excuse, in-person, beginning on second Saturday immediately preceding election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1026ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendments (89-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1026S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106127D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB1198 (Dance) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB1075 (Howell) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB1035 (Locke) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106127D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100137D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |