VA SB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; no-excuse in-person available beginning on second Saturday immediately preceding election. Allows for any registered voter to vote by absentee ballot in person beginning on the second Saturday immediately preceding any election in which he is qualified to vote without providing a reason or making prior application for an absentee ballot. The bill makes absentee voting in person available beginning on the forty-fifth day prior to the election and ending at 5:00 p.m. on the Saturday immediately preceding the election. The bill retains the current provisions for voting an absentee ballot by mail or in person prior to the second Saturday immediately preceding the election, including the application requirement and the list of statutory reasons for absentee voting. The provisions of the bill do not become effective until the November 3, 2020, general election, and the State Board of Elections is required to submit a report on the procedures and instructions it promulgates for conducting absentee voting pursuant to the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; no-excuse absentee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1026ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-20SenateReconsideration of House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with amendments (89-Y 10-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-19HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (18-Y 4-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1026S1
2019-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106127D-S1
2019-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateIncorporates SB1198 (Dance)
2019-01-29SenateIncorporates SB1075 (Howell)
2019-01-29SenateIncorporates SB1035 (Locke)
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106127D-S1
2019-01-29SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-10-17SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-10-17SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100137D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2421004(n/a)See Bill Text
242416.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242452(n/a)See Bill Text
242612(n/a)See Bill Text
242700(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text
242702.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242703.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242703.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242706(n/a)See Bill Text
242709(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1026
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1026+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1026S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1026ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0088+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1026+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0320SB1026+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1801V0023+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0089+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3013+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0866SB1026+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0868SB1026+SB1026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0954SB1026+SB1026

Bill Comments

feedback