VA SB1025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tethering of animals; adequate shelter and space. Provides that in order to meet the requirement that an animal be given adequate space, a tether must be at least three times the length of the animal or 10 feet in length, whichever is greater, and not cause injury or pain, weigh more than one-tenth of the animal's body weight, or have weights or heavy objects attached to it. Current law requires that the tether be at least three times the length of the animal. The bill exempts agricultural animals from provisions of the law related to tethering. The bill defines "adequate shelter" to mean the provision of shelter that, during hot weather, is shaded and does not readily conduct heat and, during cold weather, has a windbreak at its entrance and provides sufficient bedding material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Companion animals; adequate shelter and space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (39-Y 60-N) (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 64-N) (Y: 34 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 21-N) (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1 and #2 (25-Y 13-N) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 24-N) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
2019-04-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03SenateCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED #2 (39-Y 60-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendations # 1 and #2 (39-Y 60-N)
2019-04-03HouseReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 64-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendations #1 and #2 (34-Y 64-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation #3 (17-Y 21-N)
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1 and #2 (25-Y 13-N)
2019-04-03SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (37-Y 1-N)
2019-04-03SenateChair votes Yes
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (19-Y 19-N)
2019-03-22SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1025ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19SenateTitle replaced 19106905D-H1
2019-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 24-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with substitute (71-Y 24-N)
2019-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1025H1
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106905D-H1
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106905D-H1
2019-02-13HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-02-12HouseReferred from Rules by voice vote
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
2019-01-23SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-22SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100082D-E
2019-01-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1025E
2019-01-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-22SenateRead second time
2019-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (7-Y 6-N)
2018-10-17SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-10-17SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100082D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text
326543(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1025
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1025+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1025E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1025H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1025ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0848+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0008+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0106SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0165SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0103V0025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0080+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2864+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0793SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1137SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1138SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1139SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1140SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3429+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3431+SB1025

Bill Comments

feedback