VA SB1023 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; sharing of information. Prohibits sharing of information regarding Virginia concealed handgun permits in the Virginia Criminal Information Network with law enforcement in states that do not recognize a Virginia concealed handgun permit as valid in the state. The bill requires the Department of State Police to maintain and publish online a list of states that recognize a Virginia concealed handgun permit as valid in the state. The bill does not create a private cause of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permits; sharing of information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Ruling of Chair Not Sustained (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateRuling of Chair Not Sustained (19-Y 21-N)
2017-04-05SenateChair rules Governor's recommendation Constitutional
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's substitute printed 17106002D-S1
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1023ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-23SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 31-N)
2017-02-22HousePassed House with amendment (68-Y 31-N)
2017-02-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2017-02-22HouseAmendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to
2017-02-22HouseRead third time
2017-02-21HousePassed by for the day
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-17HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 6-N)
2017-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
2017-01-30SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25SenateReported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
2017-01-04SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100509D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.014(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.07(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1023
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1023+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1023ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1023S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0124+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0173SB1023+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0166+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0200SB1023+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1501V0032+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H15V0082+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2675+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0910SB1023+SB1023
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1090SB1023+SB1023

Bill Comments

feedback