VA SB1020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0876)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0876)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; alternative school discipline process. Allows a school board to adopt an alternative school discipline process to provide a principal and parties involved in an incident involving assault, or assault and battery without bodily injury, that occurs on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored event an option to enter into a mutually agreed-upon process between the involved parties as an alternative to reporting such incident to law enforcement. The bill provides that a principal in a school division with such an alternative accountability process may attempt to engage the parties involved in such an incident in the process prior to reporting such incident to the local law-enforcement agency and prohibits, if provided for by the school board, a principal from reporting a party who successfully completes the alternative school discipline process.
Title
Public schools; alternative school discipline process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0876) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 876 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1020ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (71-Y 29-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (71-Y 29-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1020S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107117D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107117D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20104517D |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104517D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 279.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |