VA SB1014 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Restrictive covenants; prohibited; use of Loudoun County recreational property by general public. Invalidates any restrictive covenant that prohibits the general public from using property voluntarily conveyed to Loudoun County by a nonprofit recreational association for recreational purposes. Restrictive covenants; prohibited; use of Loudoun County recreational property by general public. Invalidates any restrictive covenant that prohibits the general public from using property voluntarily conveyed to Loudoun County by a nonprofit recreational association for recreational purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrictive covenants; limits use of property in Loudoun County for recreational purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
2023-03-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-25SenateSigned by President
2023-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1014ER)
2023-02-23SenateEnrolled
2023-02-20HouseVOTE: Passage (71-Y 27-N)
2023-02-20HousePassed House (71-Y 27-N)
2023-02-20HouseRead third time
2023-02-17HousePassed by for the day
2023-02-16HousePassed by for the day
2023-02-15HousePassed by for the day
2023-02-14HouseRead second time
2023-02-10HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N)
2023-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-02-08HouseRead first time
2023-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2023-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1014S1
2023-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105116D-S1
2023-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-01SenateRead second time
2023-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105116D-S1
2023-01-30SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2023-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2023-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102552D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521800.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1014
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1014+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1014S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1014H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1014ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0642+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105116D.pdf
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S07V0030+SB1014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0178SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0201SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0702V0027+SB1014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H07V0063+SB1014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2040+SB1014

Bill Comments

feedback