VA SB1014 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Advanced Production Grant Program and Fund. Creates the Advanced Production Grant Program and Fund to make grant payments to an eligible business transportation manufacturer and producer that engages in the production of business trucks and that makes a capital investment of at least $58 million at a facility in Pittsylvania County and creates at least 703 new full-time jobs at the facility. The eligible company would be eligible for an aggregate of $7 million in grants paid out over a five-year period if it meets such performance parameters and complies with the terms of a memorandum of understanding agreed upon by the qualified company, the Commonwealth, and the Virginia Economic Development Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Production Grant Program and Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1014ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 8-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House (89-Y 8-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-27SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 20105983D
2020-01-16SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Same As/Similar To

HB1733 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB1014&201+sum+SB1014
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1014+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1014ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0763+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0064+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0206+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB1014+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0047+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0400+SB1014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1474+SB1014

Bill Comments

feedback