VA SB1013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Repeals the requirement that the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs be suspended. The bill also removes a provision allowing the court to require a defendant to present a summary prepared by the Department of Motor Vehicles of the other courts in which the defendant also owes fines and costs. The bill requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended prior to July 1, 2019, solely for nonpayment of fines or costs, provided that such person has paid the applicable reinstatement fee. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon funding in a general appropriation act. This bill incorporates SB 1310 and SB 1612.
Title
Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19104813D-ES1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1013ES1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104813D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Incorporates SB1612 (Ebbin) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Incorporates SB1310 (Edwards) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 19104813D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104813D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100084D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1200.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |