VA SB1013 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Repeals the requirement that the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs be suspended. The bill also removes a provision allowing the court to require a defendant to present a summary prepared by the Department of Motor Vehicles of the other courts in which the defendant also owes fines and costs. The bill requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended prior to July 1, 2019, solely for nonpayment of fines or costs, provided that such person has paid the applicable reinstatement fee. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon funding in a general appropriation act. This bill incorporates SB 1310 and SB 1612.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2019-01-24SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104813D-ES1
2019-01-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1013ES1
2019-01-24SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-24SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19104813D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-24SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N)
2019-01-14SenateIncorporates SB1612 (Ebbin)
2019-01-14SenateIncorporates SB1310 (Edwards)
2019-01-14SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 19104813D-S1
2019-01-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 19104813D-S1
2019-01-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-14SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-08-03SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-08-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100084D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192354(n/a)See Bill Text
192354.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332503(n/a)See Bill Text
4621200.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462301(n/a)See Bill Text
462361(n/a)See Bill Text
462391.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462395(n/a)See Bill Text
462416(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback