VA SB1013 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Host Cities Economic Development Incentive and Host Localities Transportation Support Funds. Creates the Host Localities Economic Development Incentive Fund, administered by the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, to support economic development, growth of existing businesses, and job creation related to the Port of Virginia in one or more host localities. The bill also creates the Host Localities Transportation Support Fund, administered by the Secretary of Transportation, to support transportation projects and facilities related to the Port of Virginia in one or more host localities. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Host Localities Economic Development Incentive and Transportation Support Funds; created, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1013S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105030D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105030D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101741D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Counties Cities and Towns
Economic Development
Newport News City of
Norfolk City of
Portsmouth City of
Transportation
Warren County
Counties Cities and Towns
Economic Development
Newport News City of
Norfolk City of
Portsmouth City of
Transportation
Warren County