VA SB1011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation design standards; modifications. Authorizes a Residency Engineer of the Virginia Department of Transportation, a licensed engineer designated by a Residency Engineer, or a licensed engineer selected by a Resident Administrator to approve modifications to the Department's design standards in certain situations. Department of Transportation design standards; modifications. Authorizes a Residency Engineer of the Virginia Department of Transportation, a licensed engineer designated by a Residency Engineer, or a licensed engineer selected by a Resident Administrator to approve modifications to the Department's design standards in certain situations.
Title
Transportation, Department of; application of design standards, modifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-02-20 | House | Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1011S2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator McDougle agreed to 20107669D-S2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20107255D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20107669D-S2 (McDougle) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107255D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105282D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1011 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote