VA SB101 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Scanning information from driver's license. Allows a merchant to scan the machine-readable zone of an individual's Department of Motor Vehicles-issued identification card or driver's license in order to verify authenticity of the identification card or driver's license or to verify the identity of the individual when the individual requests a service pursuant to a membership or a service agreement. Currently, a merchant is allowed to conduct such a scan for identity verification purposes if the individual pays for goods or services with a method other than cash, returns an item, or requests a refund or an exchange. The measure also allows a merchant to retain information obtained from the machine-readable zone of the identification card or driver's license for such a verification purpose. However, the merchant must destroy the retained information when the purpose for which it was provided and retained has been satisfied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license; scanning information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 542 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB101ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-28HousePassed House (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-28HouseRead third time
2020-02-27HouseRead second time
2020-02-25HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (20-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenatePrinted as engrossed 20100237D-E
2020-01-23SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB101E
2020-01-23SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-23SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-23SenateRead second time
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-12-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-12-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100237D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591443.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback